Wallace, Sarah Gail (CPSO#: 81043)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Marks, Sarah Gail (used until: 24 Aug 2005 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 400
65 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1B8
Phone: (705) 670-9048
Fax: (705) 670-9208
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah Wallace Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wallace ( CPSO# 81043 )

Business Address:
Suite 400
65 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1B8
Phone Number: (705) 670-9048

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH GAIL WALLACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALLACE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009