Wallani, Zulfikarali Abdulrahim (CPSO#: 55048)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jan 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dar Es Salaam, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Health Centre
377 Church Street
Suite 408
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 472-5733 Ext. 6536
Fax: (905) 472-5215
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zul Wallani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Wallani ( CPSO# 55048 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Health Centre
408 - 377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 472-5733

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZULFIKARALI ABDULRAHIM WALLANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALLANI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1989