Waller, Douglas Frederick (CPSO#: 23421)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 27 Jan 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jan 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 22 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Oct 2002
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 27 Jan 2003

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 Jan 2003
Summary:

 On January 27, 2003, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Waller committed acts of professional 
 misconduct in that he sexually abused six patients, engaged in acts of sexual impropriety, failed 
 to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, had been convicted of an offence relevant 
 to his suitability to practise medicine in that he has benn convicted of five counts of sexual 
 assault under the Criminal Code; and commited acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
 having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded as disgraceful, dishonourable 
 or unprofessional.  In addition, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Waller to be incompetent in 
 his care of patients and displayed a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the 
 welfare of patients.

The Discipline Committee ordered the following penalty; :

1)	a reprimand, 
 the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register;
2)	revocation of the certificate of 
 registration, effective immediately;
3)	costs to the College in the amount of 
 $1,500.00;
4)	reimbursement to the College for funding for therapy and counselling for four of the 
 	patients (named in the Notice of Hearing) up to $7,000.00;
5)	post security to guarantee payment 
 of the amounts in [(4) above]

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 27, 2003


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 07 Jul 1975
Summary:

 On July 7, 1975, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario 
 found Dr. Douglas Frederick Waller guilty of professional misconduct in that he engaged in an 
 improper association with a patient and directed that he be suspended from the Register of the 
 College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario for a period of three months and that he pay costs 
 in the amount of $1000.00.  The suspension commenced July 7, 1975.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 07 Jul 1975