Walling, Marvlyn Andrea (CPSO#: 76023)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit View Medical
B-14
1240 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5V 1N3
Phone: (905) 567-4622
Fax: (905) 567-7545
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARVLYN ANDREA WALLING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALLING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003