Wallman, Ronald Andrew (CPSO#: 57119)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone: (905) 472-7121
Fax: (905) 472-6586
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wallman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wallman ( CPSO# 57119 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone Number: (905) 472-7121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONALD ANDREW WALLMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALLMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1987