Walman, Gerald Barry (CPSO#: 26860)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite D-180
10615 W. Thunderbird Boulevard
Phoenix AZ  85351
United States
Phone: (602) 222-2020

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERALD BARRY WALMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Oct 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2017