Walman, Noah Samuel (CPSO#: 94577)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Mar 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Generations Family Health Centre
272 Lawrence Ave W
#104
Toronto ON  M5M 4M1
Phone: (416) 847 9999
Fax: 416 847 8999
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Noah S. Walman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Walman ( CPSO# 94577 )

Business Address:
Suite 104
272 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 4M1
Phone Number: (416) 847-9999

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NOAH SAMUEL WALMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2012