Walpola, Piyal Lasitha (CPSO#: 69976)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese

Education:North Colombo Medical College, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1885 Glenanna Road
Suite 205
Pickering ON  L1V 6R6
Phone: (905) 839-2214
Fax: (905) 839-7357
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Piyal Walpola Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Walpola ( CPSO# 69976 )

Business Address:
205 - 1885 Glenanna Road
Pickering ON  L1V 6R6
Phone Number: (905) 839-2214

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PIYAL LASITHA WALPOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALPOLA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1998