Walsh, Cynthia Blanche (CPSO#: 74967)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: Freeman, Cynthia Blanche (used until: 27 Aug 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4221
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4221
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8222
Fax: (613) 737-8830
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Winchester district
Memorial hospital
566 Louise st
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
Phone: (613) 774-2422
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Renfrew Victoria hospital
499 raglan st north
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 432-4851
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Iqaluit general hospital
Iqaluit, nunavut
Iqaluit NU  X0A 0H0
Canada
Phone: (867) 975-8600
County: 
Electoral District: 

75 Spring Street, Almonte, ON
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Canada
Phone: (613) 256-2500
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

350 John Street North
Arnprior, ON
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 623-3166
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Ramsey Lake Health Centre
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: 1-866-469-0822
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

soundcare medical and imaging cente
1145 Hunt Club Rd., Suite 560
Ottawa ON  K1V 0Y3
Canada
Phone: 613-738-2378
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cynthia Walsh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Walsh ( CPSO# 74967 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4982

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CYNTHIA BLANCHE WALSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALSH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 04 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 05 Jun 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2006