Walsh, Jennifer (CPSO#: 67729)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: Cochrane, Jennifer (used until: 26 Aug 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Healthcare Services
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M0L8
Phone: (905) 338-4690 Ext. 6589
Fax: (905) 845-3376
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 873-0111
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Canada
Phone: (905) 878-2383
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Walsh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Walsh ( CPSO# 67729 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
7030 Derry Road East
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 31 May 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER WALSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALSH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Nov 1996
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Dec 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2000