Walsh, Kimberley Anne (CPSO#: 90905)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Units 15 to 20
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone: (905) 632-8007
Fax: (905) 681-6341
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chalklin Duncan Gallaccio Pintea Wallik Walsh Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Walsh ( CPSO# 90905 )
Dr. R. Williams ( CPSO# 73981 )
Dr. D. Wallik ( CPSO# 53982 )
Dr. D. Pintea ( CPSO# 78124 )
Dr. G. Duncan ( CPSO# 66390 )
Dr. L. Chalklin ( CPSO# 55848 )
Dr. A. Gallaccio ( CPSO# 82590 )

Business Address:
Units 15 - 20
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone Number: (905) 632-8007

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Aug 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLEY ANNE WALSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALSH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Aug 2010 to 15 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2011