Walsh, Mary Geraldine Anne (CPSO#: 42397)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gaelic

Education:National University of Ireland, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: FileBank 188 Carlingview Drive Etobicoke ON M9W 6M8 Phone: 888-418-7833 www.filebank.ca
Date Received: 04 Aug 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1976 to 30 Jun 1977
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 05 Jul 1977 to 21 Oct 1977
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 1978 to 30 Jan 1979
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 04 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 6 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 2016