Walsh, Penelope Ethel (CPSO#: 55034)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: Simon, Penelope Ethel Walsh (used until: 10 Feb 1985 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions Inc 28 Eugene Street Toronto ON M6B 3Z4
Date Received: 04 Jul 2017

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jul 2017