Walsh, Walter Paul Gordon (CPSO#: 29521)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jan 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011