Walsh-Bergin, Paula (CPSO#: 67675)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre,
Suite 201
1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 7370
Fax: (613) 739-8400
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

C M H A
3rd Floor
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7791 Ext. 209
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Walsh-Bergin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Walsh-Bergin ( CPSO# 67675 )

Business Address:
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
201 - 2121 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 1H2
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Business Address:
300 - 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone Number: (613) 737-7791

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAULA WALSH-BERGIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALSH-BERGIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 12 Oct 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 13 Oct 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 29 Feb 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 07 Mar 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Mar 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2000