Walter, Anthony John (CPSO#: 52700)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Doctors Office
Royal Bank Plaza Medical Centre
PO Box 134
200 Bay St., Unit LR8
Toronto ON  M5J 2J3
Phone: (416) 368-6787
Fax: (416) 368-7632
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Doctors Office at Atrium
595 Bay St.
Toronto ON  M5G 2C2
Canada
Phone: 416 598 1703
Fax: 416 598 1778
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Doctors Office at Mt. Pleasant
245 Eglinton Ave E
Toronto ON  M4P 3B8
Canada
Phone: (416) 488-1455
Fax: (416) 488-8846
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Kipling Heights Medical Centre
2291 Kipling Ave.
Rexdale ON  M9W 4L6
Canada
Phone: 416 741 4545
Fax: 416 744 1484
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Health Centre
45 Overlea Boulevard
Toronto ON  M4H 1C3
Canada
Phone: (416) 696-9836 Ext. 333
Fax: 416 696 8080
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Bay College Medical and
Lockwood Diagnostic
Suite 320
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Canada
Phone: (416) 921-2121
Fax: (416) 921-0569
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Walter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Walter ( CPSO# 52700 )

Business Address:
The Doctors Office
Royal Bank Plaza Medical Centre
PO Box 134
200 Bay Street, Suite LR8
Toronto ON  M5J 2J3
Phone Number: (416) 368-6787

Business Address:
245 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 3B7
Phone Number: (416) 488-1455

Business Address:
45 Overlea Boulevard
Suite A6
Toronto ON  M4H 1C3
Phone Number: (416) 696-9836

Business Address:
2291 Kipling Avenue
Rexdale ON  M9W 4L6
Phone Number: (416) 741-4545

Business Address:
595 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C2
Phone Number: (416) 598-1703

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 02 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY JOHN WALTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALTER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Medical Microbiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1985