Walter, Thomas (CPSO#: 94642)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universite de Lyon I, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Dec 2010 to 24 Feb 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 25 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 2012