Walters, David John (CPSO#: 29439)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Oct 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Oct 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Dec 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Oct 1998