Walton, Georgia Dell (CPSO#: 93030)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
1001 Queen Street West
Unit 3-4
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Dr.
Peterborough ON  K9J7C6
Canada
Phone: 7047432121
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

1055 Yonge St.
Suite 301
Toronto ON  M4W2L2
Canada
Phone: 4169013077
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Georgia Walton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Walton ( CPSO# 93030 )

Business Address:
C A M H
Suite 3-4
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (704) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGIA DELL WALTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015