Walton, Jonathan Mark (CPSO#: 63594)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Room 4E3
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75244
Fax: (905) 521-9992
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Faculity of Health Sciences
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 525-9140
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Mark Walton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Walton ( CPSO# 63594 )
Dr. H. Boutin ( CPSO# 63543 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L9N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
323 Wilson Street East
Ancaster ON  L9G 4A8

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Room 4E3
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 27 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN MARK WALTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 6 - Paediatric Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993