Walus, Andrzej Klaudiusz (CPSO#: 111019)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Oct 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 11 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London ON  N6A 5C1
Phone: 519-6612019
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDRZEJ KLAUDIUSZ WALUS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. WALUS is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. WALUS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. WALUS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. WALUS shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. WALUS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. WALUS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Oct 2016 to 10 Jan 2017
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018