Walwyn, Ian Courtney (CPSO#: 69671)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of the West Indies, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 13 Oct 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 14 Oct 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 13 Oct 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 14 Oct 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 13 Oct 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 14 Oct 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 13 Oct 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Oct 1999