Walz, Barbara Anne Elizabeth (CPSO#: 55394)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jan 1987

Summary

Former Names: Walz LeBlanc, Barbara Anne Elizabeth (used until: 14 Jan 2009 )     Walz-Leblanc, Barbara Anne Elizabeth (used until: 11 May 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 820-9229
Fax: (905) 820-3370
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 03 Dec 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA ANNE ELIZABETH WALZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1987