Wan, Andrew Wai-Chuen (CPSO#: 69913)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 28
7010 Warden Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 5Y3
Phone: (905) 415-3773
Fax: (905) 415-2313
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew W. Wan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wan ( CPSO# 69913 )

Business Address:
28 - 7010 Warden Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 5Y3
Phone Number: (905) 415-3773

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW WAI-CHUEN WAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1998