Wan, David Anthony (CPSO#: 86695)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montebello Medical Clinic
118 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5Y1
Phone: (905) 685-6555
Fax: (905) 685-6558
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Wan & V. Wan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Wan ( CPSO# 86790 )
Dr. D. Wan ( CPSO# 86695 )

Business Address:
Montebello Medical Clinic
118 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5Y1
Phone Number: (905) 685-6555

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ANTHONY WAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009