Wan, Jonathan Fung (CPSO#: 87269)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: Wan, Jonathan Fung Hiu (used until: 09 Jan 2013 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Peel Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 4803
Fax: (905) 813-3962
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Fung Wan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wan ( CPSO# 87269 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Peel Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West 4th Floor
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 713-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN FUNG WAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2013