Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Wan, Peter Shiu Kee (CPSO#: 59477)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Boniface Park Medical Centre
Unit 6
700 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2A7
Phone: (416) 431-7100
Fax: (416) 431-7191
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

298 John Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 5W4
Canada
Phone: (905) 482-8647
Fax: (905) 482-8648
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

300 Rossland Road East
Unit 202
Ajax ON  L1Z0M1
Canada
Phone: 9052311849
Fax: 9052311829
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

5460 Yonge Street
Suite 204
North York ON  M2N 6K7
Canada
Phone: (416) 250-7171
Fax: (416) 250-0323
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Wan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wan ( CPSO# 59477 )

Business Address:
298 John Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 5W4
Phone Number: (905) 482-8648

Business Address:
Suite 204
5460 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 6K7
Phone Number: (416) 250-7171

Business Address:
Suite 202
300 Rossland Road East
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Phone Number: (905) 231-1829

Business Address:
Boniface Park Medical Centre
6 - 700 Markham Road
Richmond Hill ON  M1H 2A7
Phone Number: (416) 431-7100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER SHIU KEE WAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1989