Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Wang, Ay Ling (CPSO#: 55484)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
890 Glasgow Street
Suite 2
Kitchener ON  N2N 3G6
Phone: (519) 744-4293
Fax: (519) 744-6424
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ay-Ling Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wang ( CPSO# 55484 )

Business Address:
Suite 2
890 Glasgow Street
Kitchener ON  N2N 3G6
Phone Number: (519) 744-4293

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AY LING WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1986