Wang, Benjamin Wei En (CPSO#: 63925)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 22 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 2001