Wang, Bing (CPSO#: 86994)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:West China Medical University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Medical Microbiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 28 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 2014