Wang, Charlie Shihn-Kaai (CPSO#: 82269)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2nd Floor
353 St Paul Avenue
Brantford ON  N3R 4N3
Phone: (519) 759-8899
Fax: (519) 759-1799
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charlie Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wang ( CPSO# 82269 )

Business Address:
2nd Floor
353 St Paul Avenue
Brantford ON  N3R 4N3
Phone Number: (519) 759-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 07 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLIE SHIHN-KAAI WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Apr 2005 to 29 Apr 2005
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Apr 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007