Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Wang, Elizabeth Shuk-Ching (CPSO#: 24542)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Dec 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996