Wang, Jean Chuen Yi (CPSO#: 60976)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
7 N U
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4205
Fax: (416) 340-3590
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jean Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wang ( CPSO# 60976 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
7 N U 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4205

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 19 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN CHUEN YI WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1990