Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Wang, Paul Peng Yu (CPSO#: 60971)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2291 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9W 4L6
Phone: (416) 741-4545
Fax: (416) 744-1484
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wang ( CPSO# 60971 )

Business Address:
2291 Kipling Avenue
Toronto ON  M9W 4L6
Phone Number: (416) 741-4545

Business Address:
400 The West Mall
Toronto ON  M9C 5S1
Phone Number: (416) 394-3660

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL PENG YU WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1990