Wang, Robert Yu-Chao (CPSO#: 77765)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9651 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V7
Phone: (905) 918-2212
Fax: (905) 918-2213
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

7-2535 Major Mackenzie Dr W
Vaughan ON  L6A 1C6
Canada
Phone: 905-303-0760
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wang ( CPSO# 77765 )

Business Address:
9651 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V7
Phone Number: (905) 918-2212

Business Address:
7 - 2535 Major Mackenzie West
Vaughan ON  L6A 1C6
Phone Number: (905) 303-0760

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT YU-CHAO WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2008