Wang, Wen-Shan (CPSO#: 23952)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jun 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Dublin, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Website: www.rsrs.com Telephone: 416-398-0638 Fax: 416-398-5932 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 29 Jan 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2015

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: February 20, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Wen-Shan Wang has voluntarily ceased the practice of medicine, effective February 20, 2015.