Wang, Xiangyang (CPSO#: 88052)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Wenzhou Medical College, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 28 Jan 2008 to 27 Mar 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 28 Mar 2008 to 15 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2008