Wang, Xin-Yong (CPSO#: 78697)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, French

Education:McGill University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 120
8120 Cook Road
Richmond BC  V6Y 1T9
Phone: (604) 278-5191
Fax: (604) 278-5197

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 May 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. XIN-YONG WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2002
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2012