Wang, Xu (CPSO#: 96134)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Peking Union Medical University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
16 Andrew Street, Kitchener, ON
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone: 519-804-9234
Fax: 519-804-2604
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3G1
Canada
Phone: 519-888-4096
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Xu Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. X. Wang ( CPSO# 96134 )

Business Address:
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone Number: (519) 804-9234

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 18 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. XU WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 26 Sep 2011 to 25 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 06 Sep 2012 to 02 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 03 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 28 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 18 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2015