Wang, Yongdong (CPSO#: 86137)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Taishan Medical College, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Health Science
Center
Department of Radiology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75182
Fax: (905) 521-1390
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jul 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 14 May 2007 to 18 Jul 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 19 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2011 to 30 Apr 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 May 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Dec 2014 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Yongdong Wang may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Radiology, McMaster University, in which Dr. Wang holds an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Wang no longer holds  the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.
                        
            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Wang's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                        (iii)when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Wang's
                        certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report. 


            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2012, and expires on June 30, 2018.
                  Upon renewal of Dr. Wang's academic appointment at McMaster University,
                  the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs
                  2 and 3 above.