Wang, Yuqi (CPSO#: 105311)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Haematology
501 Smyth Road
Box 704
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YUQI WANG shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. WANG is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. WANG shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. WANG is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. WANG shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. WANG is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. WANG no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jan 2015 to 06 Feb 2015
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

Queen's University, 04 Aug 2015 to 28 Aug 2015
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 29 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018