Wannan, Barry Winston (CPSO#: 21342)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 229
31 Nova Scotia Walk
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1Y9
Phone: (705) 848-3673
Fax: (705) 848-3449
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barry W. Wannan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 17 2010


Corporation Name: Barry W. Wannan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wannan ( CPSO# 21342 )

Business Address:
Elliot Lake Family Health Team
Suite 229
31 Nova Scotia Walk
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1Y9
Phone Number: (705) 848-3673

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARRY WINSTON WANNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANNAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1968
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2009