Wannatoop, Tongporn (CPSO#: 105278)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Mahidol University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 25 Mar 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2015