Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Want, David Andrew (CPSO#: 66764)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Cancer Centre
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 522-6237 Ext. 2451
Fax: (705) 523-7329
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Andrew Want Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Want ( CPSO# 66764 )

Business Address:
Northeastern Ontario Regional
Cancer Centre
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 522-6237


Corporation Name: Pearce, Andronowski and Want Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 6 2015


Corporation Name: Want and Carlson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 4 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 13 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ANDREW WANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000