Ward, Barbara Megan (CPSO#: 55372)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 May 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7120 Hurontario St
PO Box 667 RPO Streetsville
Mississauga ON  L5M 2C2
Phone: (905) 791-7800 Ext. 2433
Fax: (905) 564-2683
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA MEGAN WARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1987