Ward, Helen Catherine (CPSO#: 69933)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6365
Fax: 613 798-2992
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 201
100 Argyle Ave
Ottawa, ON
Ottawa ON  K2P 1B6
Canada
Phone: 613 680-6828
Fax: 613 680-6829
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

221 Nelson St
Ottawa ON  K1N 1C7
Canada
Phone: 613 569-3488
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HC Ward Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ward ( CPSO# 69933 )

Business Address:
Department of Psychiatry
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Business Address:
201 - 100 Argyle Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 1B6
Phone Number: (613) 680-6828

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HELEN CATHERINE WARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2001 to 31 Jul 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001