Ward, Joel William (CPSO#: 66679)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
705 MacKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joel Ward Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ward ( CPSO# 66679 )

Business Address:
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 McKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL WILLIAM WARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1996