Ward, John Hugh (CPSO#: 58821)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Nov 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Nov 1989


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 29 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jul 1996 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Nov 1989