Ward, Michael Anthony (CPSO#: 69251)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3100
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 697-3607
Fax: (905) 697-3645
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Ward Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ward ( CPSO# 69251 )

Business Address:
Suite 2101
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 697-3607


Corporation Name: Dr. M. A. Ward Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2013

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ANTHONY WARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1997