Ward, Susan Elizabeth (CPSO#: 69271)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: 905 464 7796
Fax: (905) 813-3042
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ward Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ward ( CPSO# 69271 )

Business Address:
Milton Diagnostic Services
480 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 9A9
Phone Number: (905) 878-8831

Business Address:
410 Rosemary Road
Toronto ON  M5P 3E5
Phone Number: (416) 792-3337

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4491

Business Address:
Suite G02
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 828-0653

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-6671

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN ELIZABETH WARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000